THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF S.ANDREW WEST TARRING

Charity number: 1130723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £154.44k £157.16k £176.68k £227.45k £150.19k
Total expenditure £203.61k £224.32k £186.13k £174.42k £181.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A