Financial history THE BENEFICE OF EGLWYSILAN AND CAERPHILLY PCC

Charity number: 1131172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £244.24k £225.07k £250.40k £324.09k £158.37k
Total expenditure £231.30k £218.82k £246.57k £310.91k £159.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.76k £9.91k £700 £5.00k £2.20k