Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAVANT

Charity number: 1131684
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £98.10k £103.18k £117.85k £126.87k £111.88k
Total expenditure £107.53k £114.98k £110.64k £118.77k £98.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A