Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAVANT

Charity number: 1131684
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Martha Grace Weatherill Chair 08 September 2021
None on record
Iain Colin Campbell Trustee 15 February 2022
None on record
Susan Jennifer Jackson Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
Jenny Quest Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Sue Tostevin Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Georgina Bill Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Claire Louise Evison Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Frances Talbot Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Caroline Loten Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Zoe Karen Mann Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
SHEILA MARY SIMS Trustee 23 April 2017
LAVANT MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Deecie Tester Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Dr Jean Maria Sherrington Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Ben Smith Trustee 14 April 2015
None on record