Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BURSLEDON
Charity number: 1132121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN PAWSON | Chair | 12 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Hiscock | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Mcolm | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Bax | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Emily Oliver | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Plain | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Lynne Watts | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Taylor | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Boulter | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rob Sanders | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BURT | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER TAYLOR | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.