THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY & ST CUTHBERT PARISH CHURCH, CHESTER-LE-STREET

Charity number: 1130847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norma Hedley Trustee 11 April 2017 None on record
Doreen Butts Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
Peter Southern Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Mike Alton Trustee 12 April 2016 None on record
Terence Culkin Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
Rachel Gibson Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Jim Stothard Trustee 09 April 2013 None on record
Jon Wilkinson Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Anne Curry Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
ALEXANDER JOHN NELSON Trustee 21 April 2015
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE DURHAM TRUST Received: On time
ALEXANDER SLESSOR WEBSTER Trustee None on record
John Lane Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Dawn Hudson Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Malcolm Rowland Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
Dorothy Crichton Hall Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
June Austin Trustee 12 April 2016 None on record
REV DAVID JOHN TULLY Chair None on record
Ian Goulding Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
EDNA MAY SANDERSON Trustee None on record
John Hopper Trustee 12 April 2016 None on record