THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, GUISBOROUGH

Charity number: 1132453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £268.41k £249.80k £276.29k £267.61k £195.56k
Total expenditure £223.57k £221.14k £263.03k £296.83k £209.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £516 £1.25k £1.50k £9.77k