THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' CLEADON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Saints' Church is in Cleadon Village, Sunderland and is part of the Church of England's Diocese of Durham. The Parochial Church Council (PCC) has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It has responsibilities for the maintenance of the Church buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 21 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- All Saints Cleadon PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ALL SAINTS' CLEADON VILLAGE (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev VERNON JOHN CUTHBERT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LINDA ROSS | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jill Rowden | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverley George BA Hons | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marie Therese Philpott | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Grant | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Keith Higgin | Trustee |
|
||||||
Anne Hudson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.14k | £80.21k | £59.74k | £117.82k | £66.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.33k | £81.33k | £62.82k | £71.64k | £77.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Parish Hall
Sunderland Road
SUNDERLAND
SR6 7UR
- Phone:
- 01915190515
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window