Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL LE BELFREY WITH ST CUTHBERT, YORK

Charity number: 1130866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.18m £1.41m £814.70k £9.25m £903.06k
Total expenditure £816.13k £976.36k £1.26m £1.23m £1.15m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £8.83k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.12m £1.31m £693.65k £9.14m £814.37k
Income - Other trading activities £15.12k £14.65k £23.37k £8.20k £10.47k
Income - Charitable activities £31.73k £59.86k £76.69k £61.35k £56.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.37k £13.45k £15.14k £12.01k £7.75k
Income - Other £11.01k £15.32k £5.84k £29.64k £13.93k
Income - Legacies £177.83k £0 £0 £25.00k £23.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £814.85k £972.68k £1.26m £1.23m £1.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.28k £3.68k £3.79k £550 £764
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.66k £11.80k £12.59k £10.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £79.66k £10.94k £23.92k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0