THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL LE BELFREY WITH ST CUTHBERT, YORK

Charity number: 1130866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ross Kenyon Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
JOHN EDWIN LINDLEY Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Joseph McKeogh Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
Alys Rachel Tarr Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
JIM ROBERTS Trustee None on record
Andrew Oldroyd Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Alison Dawson Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Rev MATTHEW JAMES PORTER Chair
ST MICHAEL-LE-BELFREY WITH ST WILFRID CHARITIES FOR THE POOR Received: On time
ST WILFRID'S ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
ONE VOICE YORK Received: On time
ST HILD COLLEGE Received: 51 days late
Danielle Cook Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Rev Andrew James Baker Trustee 07 December 2018 None on record
Rev CHRISTIAN NATHAN SELVARATNAM Trustee None on record
Martine Somerville Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
Rev Victoria Jane Earll Trustee 26 September 2020 None on record
Alexandra Mali Ruth Hale Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Christopher Dobson Trustee 25 April 2016
ST WILFRID'S ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
Tony Scott Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Rev Michael James Perkins Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Remi Melanie Oduyemi Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
DANIEL CRISPIN BROOKES Trustee
ST MICHAEL-LE-BELFREY WITH ST WILFRID CHARITIES FOR THE POOR Received: On time