Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEDHAM

Charity number: 1130860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 December 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 December 2021 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window