THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST MATTHEW, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1131805
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £386.98k £525.62k £536.21k £377.42k £441.01k
Total expenditure £421.33k £392.32k £410.49k £427.26k £403.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £491.70k £454.97k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £18.21k £9.05k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £8.82k £6.67k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £6.90k £3.27k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £62.25k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £18.00k £1.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £392.32k £410.49k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.52k £8.09k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £33.00k £31.62k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A