Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST MATTHEW, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1131805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard Murray Coombs Chair 24 November 2018
None on record
Michael Owen Bishop Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Anna Elizabeth Laszlo Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Sarah Dixon Trustee 10 April 2022
NAUNTON PARK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Overdue by 141 days
Andy Horton Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Russell Heusch Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Natalie Storey Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Anna Gorick Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Julia Elizabeth Sawers Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Nerys Joyce Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Tony Whitbread Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Oliver Graham Parker Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Sarah Tilson Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Claire Rachel Chesworth Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Mary Horder Trustee 07 April 2019
FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHELTENHAM
Received: On time
DANIEL WRIGHT Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
RUPERT COX Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Graham Nicholls Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Diane Bruckland Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
DAVID WARREN Trustee 10 May 2012
None on record
David Royston Evans Trustee
ALDRO SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time