THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. STEPHEN, SOUNDWELL, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1131503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEOFFREY HARRIS Trustee
37TH KINGSWOOD (ST STEPHEN'S, SOUNDWELL) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
NICOLA CLARE READ Trustee None on record
Carolyn Jane Hawkins Trustee 12 April 2015 None on record
Gill Mae Mayo Trustee 30 March 2018 None on record
Caroline Smith Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
William Alfred Bishop Trustee 10 April 2015 None on record
WILLIAM STANLEY BROOKSHAW Trustee None on record
Patricia Anne Phipps Trustee 12 April 2015 None on record
REV Lisa Jayn Wigmore Chair 20 September 2016 None on record
JULIA MERRIFIELD Trustee 28 April 2012 None on record
Susan Humphrey Trustee 10 April 2016 None on record
REV A.J.G. COOPER Trustee
H.E. & L.G. COOPER CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
LINDA MARION COOPER Trustee None on record
Lorraine Sanderson Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
SUSAN CLEMENTS Trustee None on record
PETER GEORGE ROBBINS BA. B.ED Trustee None on record