Accounts and annual returns TRUST IN LEARNING LIMITED

Charity number: 1131823
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 June 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required