Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEWORTH CHRIST CHURCH, DIOCESE OF YORK
Charity number: 1130896

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Mary Reid | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hogg | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean Taylor | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Gilbert | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jill Welburn | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eric William Welburn | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erica Jolanda Holland | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie Amanda Baldwin | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Ayres | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Vivienne Clarke | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Tong | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.