THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY JESMOND, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 16 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY PCC JESMOND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TIMOTHY SANDERSON | Chair | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Alan Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Bowe | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Thornhill | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KAY LAWSON | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Mhairi Elizabeth McDermott Duigan | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND ANN JOHNSON B.SC | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Ann FARRIMOND | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth DUNBAR | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Malcolm Curtis | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John David Matthews | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
James William Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Nicola Thomas | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Philip Farrimond | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Joy Edwards | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVID WRIGHT | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HELEN COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.77k | £203.32k | £211.27k | £230.72k | £267.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.67k | £194.90k | £208.64k | £215.87k | £222.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH OFFICE
CHURCHILL GARDENS
JESMOND
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 1HB
- Phone:
- 01912813399
- Email:
- office@ht.church
- Website:
-
ht.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window