Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY & ALL SAINTS, BINGHAM

Charity number: 1131217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev'd Jon Wright Chair 11 December 2017
None on record
SIMON CHARLES KIRSOP Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
JOHN DAVID MILLER Trustee 18 March 2020
None on record
Ruth Ross Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Wendy Sarah Forbes-Buckingham Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
linda Winifred Walden Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
Kate Gent Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
JOHN PHILIP WOODMAN Trustee 16 May 2011
None on record
PHILIP HENRY BACON Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF BINGHAM PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
THE BINGHAM TRUST SCHEME
Received: On time
VIVIEN URSULA DYER Trustee
None on record
PETER KIRKBRIDE Trustee
None on record
CAPTAIN ALAN STEPHEN COOPER CA MBE Trustee
None on record