CASTLE SCHOOL (CAMBRIDGE) CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1139105
Charity reporting is up to date (168 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 October 2021 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 15 November 2021 168 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2021 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 April 2021 326 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 28 June 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required