CASTLE SCHOOL (CAMBRIDGE) CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1139105
Charity reporting is up to date (168 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.49k £2.93k £7.32k £47.20k £89.20k
Total expenditure £1.68k £685 £397 £5.89k £70.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A