Rectorial Benefice of the Glamorgan Heritage Coast PCC

Charity number: 1131490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time Download