Rectorial Benefice of the Glamorgan Heritage Coast PCC

Charity number: 1131490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALUN VAUGHAN JENKINS Trustee 10 September 2018
EWENNY RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY Received: On time
Ruth Rhiannon Thomas Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Rev Kathryn Rhian Prime Trustee 25 September 2017 None on record
Canon Edwin Charles Robert Counsell Chair 15 December 2016 None on record
Rev Craig Aaron Vaughan Trustee 27 March 2017 None on record
Richard Julian Simpson Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
ALAN GEOFFREY SEMMENS Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Sian Elizabeth Evans Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
LYNDA MARGARET MUMFORD Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Joyce Newton Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Penelope Ayres Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
MARIE JANE SHEPPARD Trustee None on record
Sharon Mary Evans Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Patricia Mary Bennett Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
JOSEPHINE MAIR TAYLOR Trustee None on record
EDWARD WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
JEFFREY LESLIE ROBINSON B.A., M.ED Trustee None on record