Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHANDLER'S FORD
Charity number: 1131152

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD DR IAN NICHOLAS BIRD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Debbie Pearce | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Benham | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Luz Mendoza Groves | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Bateman | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hayley Richens | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Divall | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Dobson | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anfield | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penny Thatcher | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hodgson | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Giles Keith Richardson | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Una Mary Barter | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JUDITH BIRD | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE CHRISTINE MURSELL | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ADDISS | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ELIZABETH READ | Trustee |
|
||||||
GLORIA JEANNE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ALICE NOLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE SARAH CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.