Trustees WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PETER JOHN CORNICK Chair 01 September 2018
HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
KING'S CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 6 days late
Ruth Yorke Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Martin Single Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Janice Francis Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
MARTIN JOHN SINGLE Trustee 25 October 2022
WEST LONDON MISSION HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Pei Ling Chay Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Kin Lok Leung Trustee 01 September 2022
KING'S CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 6 days late
Gabriel Jian Ye Koay Trustee 01 September 2022
KING'S CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 6 days late
Deacon Tessa Bennett Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Margaret Florence Rudland Trustee 06 January 2021
None on record
CATHERINE MANORAMA SLATER Trustee 24 November 2020
HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
RAYMAN WONG Trustee 20 August 2020
None on record
EMERSON RIZZI Trustee 24 September 2019
HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Jongikaya Zihle Dr Trustee 01 September 2019
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON
Received: 85 days late
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
Y CARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
GERRY WONG Trustee 04 November 2018
None on record
ELIZABETH MARY HICKS Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
LAI KUIN CHEONG Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Rev JAMES ALAN CRUDDAS Trustee 01 January 2015
HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ALETHEA CHIA JUNG SIOW Trustee 28 June 2012
HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
EDNA WIJERATNA Trustee 19 June 2012
HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev KONG CHING HII Trustee 08 June 2011
KING'S CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 6 days late
GORDON TREVOR SLATER FCCA CTA Trustee 10 January 1995
WEST LONDON MISSION HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time