THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HERSHAM

Charity number: 1131361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 November 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time Download