THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HERSHAM

Charity number: 1131361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Richards Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
LYNNE CLAIRE WATSON Trustee None on record
MARGARET HICKS Trustee
CHARITY OF ROBERT PHILLIPS Received: On time
ACTION FOR CARERS (SURREY) Received: On time
Rev JACKIE RICHARDSON Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Paul Michael Hughes Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Claire Warne Trustee 24 October 2020 None on record
Jackie Murphy Mrs Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
David Mealor Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
REVEREND SUE GRAY Trustee None on record
JANE ANDERSON Trustee 24 July 2017 None on record
MALCOLM REID Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Patricia Margaret Shore Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Katherine Ind Trustee 24 October 2020 None on record
Lorelie Staines Trustee 24 October 2020 None on record
Andrew Strong Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
MRS LULU BUTTON Trustee None on record
MR TONY SKRZYPECKI Trustee None on record
Julie Whing Trustee 24 October 2020 None on record