Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, NOTTINGHAM
Charity number: 1134708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE SILVESTER | Chair |
|
||||||
Pauline Jean Walker | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
William Michael James | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bowpitt | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tai Yin 'Daniel' Tsoi | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Peacock | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adriana Cifuentes | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tasha Genk-Morton | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dagoberto Rodriguez | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Paradise | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Chamberlain | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace James | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Linda Pheasant | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor David Peel | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Anne Fletcher | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Richard Butler | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Day | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Wakefield | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN PARADISE | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.