Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARK, KENSAL RISE

Charity number: 1132172
Charity reporting is up to date (168 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 April 2022 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 April 2022 168 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 January 2018 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 January 2018 89 days late Download Open in new window