Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARK, KENSAL RISE

Charity number: 1132172
Charity reporting is up to date (168 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £136.56k £153.20k £198.94k £216.48k £190.32k
Total expenditure £174.09k £174.09k £204.02k £127.46k £163.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A