Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARK, KENSAL RISE

Charity number: 1132172
Charity reporting is up to date (168 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev William Leaf Chair 04 September 2016
None on record
John Palmer Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Katie Barringer Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Shantel Earle Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Alistair Campbell Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Gillian Thompson Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rosabel Johnston Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Douglas Morton Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Mauricio Pinheiro Barbosa Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
Caroline Winterburn Trustee 30 April 2017
NEW GROWTH MINISTRIES TRUST
Received: On time
DANIELS DEN
Received: On time
Sue Bush Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Ingrid Cope Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
VIVIENNE MCKOY-SALT Trustee 30 April 2013
CHALKHILL COMMUNITY TRUST FUND
Received: On time