Financial history The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Up Holland and Dalton

Charity number: 1131230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £151.65k £148.05k £132.16k £226.99k £230.95k
Total expenditure £130.61k £133.83k £142.98k £175.38k £197.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A