Trustees The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Up Holland and Dalton

Charity number: 1131230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

28 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul Lock Chair 01 April 2020
UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Hilary Jane Wankling Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Angela Mary Nielson Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Jen Williams Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
STEPHANIE ELLIS Trustee 21 May 2021
THE OCCASIONAL SINGERS
Received: On time
HELEN FOSTER Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Linda Ray Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Neil Girvin Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Eve Barr Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
David Hutton Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Sylvia Samples Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Rev Jack Shepherd Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Brenda Entwistle Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Beryl Trainor Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Valerie Garner Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Gaynor Roberts Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Dr Alaric Hicks Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
John Gardner Trustee 01 April 2020
UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Dorothy Smith Trustee 01 April 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTIAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, HAYDOCK
Received: On time
David Wright Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Elisabeth Heyes Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Paul Givens Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Dennis Roughley Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Chris Dunbar Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Steve Holmes Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Alison Woods Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Denise Givens Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Martin Starkey Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record