THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY ABBOTS, KENSINGTON

Charity number: 1132235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.57m £620.47k £696.92k £580.00k £440.19k
Total expenditure £1.42m £605.05k £668.97k £578.71k £525.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £730.00k £219.93k £278.57k £184.84k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £674.37k £349.84k £354.04k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £24.15k £21.87k £21.68k £359.44k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £28.04k £27.23k £31.74k £35.73k N/A
Income - Other £112.81k £1.61k £10.88k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £200 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £538.46k £574.63k £482.36k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £104.23k £36.74k £54.16k £54.00k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £78.30k £29.85k £40.18k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.72k £69.74k £63.52k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £2.62k £3.35k £6.41k £6.62k N/A
Expenditure - Other £78.30k £29.85k £40.18k £42.35k N/A