THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY ABBOTS, KENSINGTON

Charity number: 1132235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Guy Hillard Heald Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Rev Alice Elizabeth Ormondroyd Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Ivell Arnold Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
NIGEL DAVID GRIEVE Trustee 01 January 2017
FRIENDS OF ST MARY ABBOTS CHURCH, KENSINGTON Received: On time
Rev Emma Ruth Dinwiddy Smith Chair 08 September 2019 None on record
Rev Christopher Thomas Augustine Rogers Trustee 10 June 2021 None on record
Dania El-Kadi Trustee 14 November 2018
IMPACT LEBANON CHARITY Recently registered
David Lewis Shaw Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
DAVID JOHN WILKINSON BA, BTECH. Trustee None on record
Emma Jane Porteous Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Patricia Ann Wilson Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
James Elliott Dunford Wood Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
David Maybury Peerless Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
Alexander Jueguen Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Peter David Darrell Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
Rebecca Tinsley Trustee 21 April 2021
HENRY AND REBECCA TINSLEY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
NETWORK FOR AFRICA Received: On time
Edward Mark Warrick Trustee 16 September 2020
THE ST MARY ABBOTS SCHOOL TRUST Received: On time
Margaret Enid Lane Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record