Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW ROXBOURNE HARROW

Charity number: 1131727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window