THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES', CLITHEROE

Charity number: 1131419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Paul Dowd Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Andrew John Stevens Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Helen Potts Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record
Dr Nicholas Charles Shelley Trustee 27 April 2018 None on record
Jonathan Frank Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Janet Mary Fife White Trustee 27 April 2018 None on record
Rev MARK WILLIAM LESLIE PICKETT DIP TH Chair None on record
RUTH HALDANE Trustee 28 April 2014
MY MINISTRY Recently registered
Eleanor Wood Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Debra Hardie Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
Naomi Lynas Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Alison Groves Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Lucy Skelton Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Sue Clark Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Peter Williams Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Naomi Grace Allen Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
MARY HOWARTH Trustee None on record