Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN, EAST GRINSTEAD.

Charity number: 1131405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window