Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN, EAST GRINSTEAD.

Charity number: 1131405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN WILLIAM DURRANT Trustee 18 April 2021
THE DANCERS' FORGET ME NOT FUND
Received: On time
Stephen John Linton Trustee 18 April 2021
ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH, EAST GRINSTEAD, RESTORATION TRUST
Received: On time
Abraham Frans Johannes Frankhuijzen Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
John William Bryant Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Frank Allum Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Moeena Winsor Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
John William Lancaster Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Katharine Penny Mooney Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Deborah Elaine Ratcliffe Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
VIVIENNE HOBBS Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
PENELOPE ANN FISHER Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Rev ANDREW ROBERT HAWKEN BD AKC Trustee 09 November 2016
ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH, EAST GRINSTEAD, RESTORATION TRUST
Received: On time
Dorothy Lynn Ellis Trustee 12 April 2015
None on record
Revd Canon Julia Kathleen Peaty Trustee
BROADFIELD CHURCH YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL CRAWLEY
Overdue by 87 days
JOHN ELLIS Trustee
THE ROTARY CLUB OF EAST GRINSTEAD MERIDIAN TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JEREMY ROBIN KAYE MA FCIS Trustee
None on record
JEAN PATRICIA PARSONS Trustee
None on record
LINDA PATRICIA BRYANT Trustee
None on record