THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STOTFOLD

Charity number: 1131275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 July 2017 On time Download