BATUS GENERAL FUND

Charity number: 1136176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 18 November 2020 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 18 November 2020 326 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2016 29 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 July 2016 On time Download