THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CLEMENT, URMSTON

Charity number: 1131185
Charity reporting is overdue by 360 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MADELINE CADMAN Trustee 17 March 2019 None on record
CHRISTINE ANN BAILEY Trustee None on record
PAUL WILSON Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
BARBARA ENGLISH Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
CLARE COLLINGE Trustee 19 March 2018 None on record
DANIEL JOHN MELLOR Trustee None on record
JENNIFER GROVES Trustee 19 March 2017 None on record
BERYL CAMPBELL PRINCE Trustee None on record
NORMA MELLOR Trustee None on record
DIANE GREEN Trustee 17 March 2019 None on record
JANICE JONES Trustee 19 March 2017 None on record
LYNN SMITH Trustee 19 March 2017 None on record
PAULINE KEOGH Trustee 17 March 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER JONES Trustee 17 March 2013 None on record
REV KAREN MARSHALL Chair 29 November 2014 None on record
RONALD GRIFFITHS Trustee 19 March 2018 None on record