Financial history ST PETERS IPC TRUST CORPORATION

Charity number: 1134300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.31k £3.82k £4.65k £1 £1.18k
Total expenditure £6.29k £7.28k £10.94k £1 £3.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A