AL-IMAN ARABIC AND SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1133446
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £31.81k £73.36k £61.80k £73.74k £66.66k
Total expenditure £39.84k £55.70k £61.40k £86.64k £50.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A