Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, KENTON
Charity number: 1132234

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Jonathan Norman | Chair | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Afriyie | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elesia Service | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Luke Anand Rajan | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Anand | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beauty Huntley | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA EDWARDS | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Williams | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET MONICA IONE CAMERON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE BRENDA LABASTIDE | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEILA BULLARD | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Griffiths | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE STILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLORIA ELEITH COWANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENRICK ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHNETTE ELAINE CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA YORKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.