MUSIC ACTION INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MUSIC ACTION INTERNATIONAL CREATE LIFE-CHANGING MUSIC PROGRAMMES WITH WAR SURVIVORS TO OVERCOME THE EFFECTS OF WAR-RELATED TRAUMA. EVERY YEAR, WE SUPPORT AROUND 2000 CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULT REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AFFECTED BY WAR, SEXUAL VIOLENCE, TORTURE, DISCRIMINATION, HATE CRIME, AND RELATED TRAUMA IN THE UK, SIERRA LEONE AND BOSNIA-HERCEGOVINA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,309 from 4 government contract(s) and £20,000 from 20000 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Georgia
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 10 June 2010: Standard registration
- MWB (Working name)
- MUSICIANS WITHOUT BORDERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shalita Davda | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Keith Beardon | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Steadman | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leena Sahloul | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Daniel Diaz Vera | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
sepidehsahar amiri | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.26k | £142.17k | £117.52k | £150.57k | £241.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.38k | £122.27k | £172.25k | £169.00k | £213.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £300 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.31k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.58k | £18.45k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/03/2015
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PRESERVE & PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS = TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM = THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS;
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISLINGTON MILL STUDIOS
ISLINGTON MILL
JAMES STREET
SALFORD
M3 5HW
- Phone:
- 07515410688
- Email:
- hello@musicaction.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window