THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FISHERTON ANGER (ST PAUL), SALISBURY

Charity number: 1132168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £679.74k £636.91k £685.39k £679.09k £587.58k
Total expenditure £648.64k £681.15k £670.00k £695.13k £616.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £9.64k £0 £4.03k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £589.08k £543.12k £565.08k £521.89k £470.70k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £43.60k £58.31k £60.85k £54.69k
Income - Charitable activities £90.13k £49.75k £61.76k £95.95k £62.20k
Income - Endowments £19 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £440 £446 £242 £408 £572
Income - Other £100 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £646.32k £681.15k £670.00k £695.13k £579.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.32k £2.02k £2.89k £2.00k £3.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £36.53k