THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FISHERTON ANGER (ST PAUL), SALISBURY

Charity number: 1132168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Burns Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Andrea Walker Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
Marion Foster Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
MR L M JOHN BAXTER-BROWN Trustee 02 July 2013
GRAIN OF WHEAT INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
THE LLOYD FOUNDATION Received: On time
RICHARD OGILVIE MERLOTT CHITTY Trustee
SALISBURY STREET PASTORS Received: On time
Matthew Titman Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
DR P BRACEGIRDLE Trustee None on record
Andrew Ferguson Trustee 13 May 2019
PROJECTS DELIVERING HOPE Received: On time
Chris Colyer Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record
Sheena Gauld Trustee 23 September 2019 None on record
Semih Kazali Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record
Rev Alastair Etheridge Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Paul Wilson Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
Claire Lewis Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record
Rev CRAIG JAMES RYALLS Chair 27 July 2014 None on record
DR David James Massey MEng MIET Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
Dr JOHN ROBERT STEPHENSON Trustee 05 July 2011 None on record
ELIZABETH POLLARD Trustee
THE LIGHTSHIP - SALISBURY CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING TRUST Received: On time
Denise Turner Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
Penny Hayes Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
Kingsley Fewins Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record