CHURCH ON THE ROCK (OLDBURY)

Charity number: 1132952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2021 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 July 2020 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 29 November 2017 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required