Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HERNE BAY CHRIST CHURCH [HAMPTON ST ANDREW'S]
Charity number: 1135078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Peter Fellows | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE KAREN SAUNDERS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Snelson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances Rogers | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Martyn Green | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tregurtha Beagley | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Malcolm Owen | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Hibbert | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Leslie Rogers | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darran Lee Hibbert | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Bovingdon | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EVANS | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Sally Snelson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Seaton Plummer | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dave Payne | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Sara JOHNSTON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DENISE JACQUELINE PARRETT | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANTHONY WILLIAM EVERETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.