THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1131697
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 November 2018 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 November 2018 16 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 July 2017 On time Download